Trustees LEARNING SPACE

Charity number: 1061545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Scott Chair 01 October 2021
None on record
Sue Swain-Fossey Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Senel Govind Trustee 11 December 2020
None on record
Alison Hopkins Trustee 03 September 2018
None on record
JAYNE MARION MOCKLER Trustee 25 April 2018
DORKING BEATITUDES LIMITED
Received: On time
CLAIRE LOUISE PARRY Trustee 06 July 2017
ST PAUL'S C OF E SCHOOL TRUST FUND (DORKING)
Received: On time
Susan Light Trustee 06 July 2017
None on record