KENNET DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 308095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Hilary Rowena Crystal Kelly Trustee 27 April 2020 None on record
Tom Alexander Seward Trustee 04 December 2019 None on record
Daniel Roch Trustee 13 February 2019 None on record
Brian Charles Soulby Trustee 06 November 2018 None on record
Paul Fisher Trustee 01 June 2013 None on record
IAN MICHAEL ROBINSON Trustee 05 August 2020
1ST INKPEN AND KINTBURY SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Peter Jeffreys Trustee 12 October 2018 None on record
Conor James O'Neill Trustee 04 September 2019 None on record
DIANNA MARY WHEATLEY Trustee None on record
ALAN ASKEY Trustee 23 June 2016 None on record
Mary Eveline Osbourne Trustee 30 June 2014 None on record