Trustees WOODSTOCK EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELAINE STOKES Chair
WOODSTOCK RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Aidan Mark Salter Trustee 06 October 2022
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, WOODSTOCK
Received: On time
Caron Jayne Fleetwood Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Ulli Parkinson Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
Joanne Roberta Onions Trustee 15 June 2017
None on record
Katy Addy Trustee 15 June 2017
None on record
Sandra Rasch Trustee 15 June 2015
None on record
Gerald Myatt Trustee 01 June 2014
None on record
DR ELIZABETH POSKITT OBE Trustee 16 December 2013
None on record
ROLAND FRANK COLLINGWOOD Trustee 12 March 2002
THE OXFORD BUS MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
JULIE ANNE SYMCOX Trustee
None on record