Financial history ST EDWARD'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 309681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £23.32m £24.60m £24.95m £25.70m £29.68m
Total expenditure £22.43m £23.51m £23.23m £26.11m £28.81m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £88.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.15m £519.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £167.00k £81.00k £347.00k £305.00k £632.00k
Income - Other trading activities £853.00k £873.00k £557.00k £128.00k £916.00k
Income - Charitable activities £22.10m £23.25m £22.64m £24.53m £27.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £189.00k £328.00k £248.00k £208.00k £160.00k
Income - Other £10.00k £51.00k £1.15m £525.00k £0
Income - Legacies £21.00k £9.00k £277.00k £205.00k £416.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.26m £22.94m £22.57m £25.97m £28.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £145.00k £77.00k £201.00k £149.00k £130.00k
Expenditure - Governance £19.00k £20.00k £24.00k £30.00k £29.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.00k £13.00k £21.00k £49.00k £37.00k
Expenditure - Other £1.02m £502.00k £453.00k £0 £0