Trustees THE INDIAN MUSLIM WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1067746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAFIK DABHAD Chair
None on record
Hussein Dharma Trustee 25 July 2021
None on record
Zakariya Basser Trustee 25 July 2021
None on record
Ismail Patel Trustee 29 February 2020
None on record
Masum Karolia Trustee 29 February 2020
None on record
Ismail Suleman Trustee 10 February 2018
None on record
Dr IMTIYAZ AHMED PATEL Trustee 18 February 2017
AL-IHSAN TRUST
Received: On time
RASHID AHMED SONI Trustee 13 February 2016
None on record
JAFAR DAJI Trustee 13 February 2016
None on record
Mohamed Hanif Mulla Trustee 18 April 2012
None on record
MR AZIZ DAJI Trustee
MILEN CARE
Received: On time
MR AHMED LUNAT OBE Trustee
None on record