Trustees THE JAMES MCLELLAN AND ANTHONY WHEELER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 310484
Charity reporting is overdue by 1371 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL BROWN Chair 01 September 2018
None on record
Michael Younger Trustee 23 May 2019
None on record
Garry Stewart Trustee 20 April 2019
None on record
Stephen Crighton Trustee 20 April 2019
None on record
Paul Stokes Trustee 16 March 2018
None on record
Harriet Butcher Trustee 20 April 2015
None on record
NIGEL WALLACE BROWN Trustee
None on record