THE JOYCE FRANKLAND TRUST, NEWPORT

Charity number: 310862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Richard Charles Gray Chair 24 August 2017
JANE BRADBURY'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
JULIA COLLINS Trustee 12 March 2016
CAMBRIDGE LITERARY FESTIVAL Received: 39 days late
Dr Victoria Bateman Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record
CHARLES KEITH HUDDLESTONE Trustee 12 March 2015 None on record
DAVID GAILLARD Trustee 10 October 2017 None on record