BEECHWOOD PARK SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 311068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 16 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 July 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 July 2019 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 21 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On time Download