BEECHWOOD PARK SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 311068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.59m £7.10m £7.57m £7.98m £7.81m
Total expenditure £6.31m £6.52m £7.29m £7.60m £7.41m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £246.83k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.58k £37.28k £145.26k £163.41k £308.53k
Income - Other trading activities £46.12k £36.73k £23.00k £30.30k £12.29k
Income - Charitable activities £6.54m £7.02m £7.39m £7.27m £7.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.78k £0 £4.90k £11.29k £6.66k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £498.77k £330.28k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.22m £6.52m £7.16m £7.45m £7.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £76.18k £0 £0 £150.50k £48.26k
Expenditure - Governance £9.55k £29.48k £0 £20.11k £22.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £6.90k £124.58k £0 £0