Accounts and annual returns NORFOLK AND NORWICH ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 311116
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 November 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 November 2021 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 February 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required