Trustees NORFOLK AND NORWICH ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 311116
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ANDREW HUTCHESON Chair 29 September 2018
None on record
Heather Wallis Trustee 04 September 2021
None on record
Dr ANNIE GRANT Trustee 05 September 2020
None on record
Alan Edward PASK Trustee 28 November 2019
None on record
Dr Clare Haynes Trustee 05 October 2019
HUNGATE MEDIEVAL ART
Received: On time
Andrew Rogerson Trustee 05 October 2019
THE NORFOLK ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: On time
Margaret Gooch Trustee 29 September 2018
None on record
MS SOPHIE CABOT Trustee 05 December 2015
HUNGATE MEDIEVAL ART
Received: On time
ROGER BELLINGER FIA Trustee 05 December 2015
None on record
TREVOR NUTHALL Trustee 05 December 2015
None on record
DR VICTOR MORGAN Trustee 05 December 2015
None on record