Financial history NORFOLK AND NORWICH ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 311116
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £25.78k £24.69k £237.31k £30.87k £30.26k
Total expenditure £22.40k £34.72k £37.80k £21.18k £24.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A