Financial history ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £2.89k £1.92k £6.96k £2.00k £2.04k
Total expenditure £2.47k £4.38k £1.91k £1.67k £680
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A