Trustees ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LANCELOT REGINALD VICK Chair 01 October 1997
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE JOHN PHILLIPS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
DAVID NORRIS Trustee 09 May 2017
THE JOHN PHILLIPS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
Richard Arthur Cooper Trustee 14 February 2017
THE JOHN PHILLIPS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time
MICHAEL JOHN HOUGHTON Trustee 14 October 2003
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE JOHN PHILLIPS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
WILLIAM COOK Trustee 13 November 2000
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE JOHN PHILLIPS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
JOHN ALEXANDRE HUGGINSON Trustee 19 July 2000
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE JOHN PHILLIPS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time
DAVID JOHN HICKS Trustee 01 July 1999
TETBURY WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE JOHN PHILLIPS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROMNEY CHARITY (OTHERWISE TETBURY CHARITY ESTATE)
Received: On time