Financial history THORNBURY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311705
Charity reporting is overdue by 227 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.54k £8.02k £8.22k £6.26k £8.30k
Total expenditure £6.73k £6.34k £11.22k £5.55k £14.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A