Trustees THORNBURY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311705
Charity reporting is overdue by 265 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW GRIFFITHS Chair 20 January 2010
None on record
Jayne Stansfield Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Keiran Patrick John Warren Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record
Timothy John Kevin Parfit Trustee 09 October 2017
None on record
CHRIS HOLLAND Trustee 11 October 2016
None on record
GRAHAM WEAVER Trustee 20 January 2010
None on record
BRIAN GEORGE ARTHUR DAVIDGE Trustee 22 July 1992
None on record
STEPHEN WILLIAM HEAVEN Trustee 22 July 1992
None on record
ERIC JAMES ANDREWS Trustee 22 July 1992
None on record