THE SAINT JOHN'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £14.30m £15.83m £17.10m £19.19m £18.43m
Total expenditure £13.72m £14.69m £15.94m £18.34m £17.91m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £446.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £237.76k £176.04k £123.95k £154.61k £133.28k
Income - Other trading activities £103.90k £134.06k £21.58k £36.59k £33.06k
Income - Charitable activities £13.91m £15.48m £16.91m £18.38m £17.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £50.07k £40.65k £43.38k £54.33k £52.09k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £566.15k £446.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £3.00k £0 £0 £10.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.45m £14.53m £15.83m £17.08m £17.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £273.37k £169.34k £108.35k £196.69k £145.19k
Expenditure - Governance £27.02k £27.62k £29.43k £23.85k £24.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £10.76k £10.91k £10.90k £10.75k £10.63k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.06m £0