ALDRO SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 312072
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 July 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 15 July 2021 45 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 22 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 12 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 12 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 14 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 24 March 2017 On time Download