ALDRO SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 312072
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mervyn Lloyd Samuel Thomas Trustee 25 August 2020
THE STAPLEFORD CENTRE Received: On time
Iona Trehearn Gunner Trustee 25 August 2020 None on record
Sarah Louise Hunt Trustee 15 June 2017 None on record
James Benjamin Henry Geffen Trustee 22 March 2018 None on record
Tim Johns Trustee 22 March 2018 None on record
Tim Woodhouse Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
Edward Reid Trustee 17 November 2016 None on record
Thomas David Llewellyn Jones Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
Rev Margot Spencer Trustee 16 March 2017 None on record
Ian Peter Waller Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
GARTH TAYLOR WILLIAMS Trustee 30 November 2011 None on record