ALDRO SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 312072
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £3.90m £3.76m £4.02m £3.99m £3.76m
Total expenditure £4.01m £3.91m £4.00m £3.86m £3.83m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £166.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £31.47k £96.42k £82.47k £77.68k £53.25k
Income - Other trading activities £45.41k £53.28k £47.58k £57.94k £23.46k
Income - Charitable activities £3.71m £3.48m £3.74m £3.69m £3.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £294 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £110.22k £128.83k £154.18k £164.16k £254.70k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.98m £3.87m £3.96m £3.80m £3.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.28k £15.26k £11.41k £17.86k £71.31k
Expenditure - Governance £21.23k £24.66k £28.52k £23.94k £23.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £31.21k £27.06k £32.81k £41.26k £0