KING ALFRED SCHOOL SOCIETY

Charity number: 312590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 14 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 11 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 26 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 25 May 2017 On time Download