KING ALFRED SCHOOL SOCIETY

Charity number: 312590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £10.94m £11.52m £12.13m £12.51m £12.44m
Total expenditure £11.14m £10.93m £11.33m £11.75m £11.49m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £188.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £72.59k £73.07k £126.29k £123.79k £369.52k
Income - Other trading activities £87.82k £103.56k £33.75k £43.17k £31.00k
Income - Charitable activities £10.76m £11.32m £11.92m £12.28m £11.98m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.93k £392 £55.24k £14.16k £19.57k
Income - Other £14.57k £21.87k £0 £56.07k £36.34k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.13m £10.93m £11.28m £11.70m £11.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £48.29k £48.75k £33.08k
Expenditure - Governance £40.33k £36.72k £29.06k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £7.58k £0 £0 £0 £0