Accounts and annual returns Forest School, London

Charity number: 312677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window