Financial history Forest School, London

Charity number: 312677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £23.04m £24.93m £25.38m £25.85m £28.43m
Total expenditure £22.60m £24.59m £24.81m £25.42m £27.80m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.08k £10.53k £355.53k £199.77k £3.54k
Income - Other trading activities £1.20m £1.19m £787.68k £690.63k £1.19m
Income - Charitable activities £21.83m £23.21m £23.66m £24.37m £26.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.09k £14.26k £10.30k £1.54k £2.01k
Income - Other £0 £508.33k £566.60k £590.24k £703.95k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.60m £23.58m £24.00m £24.68m £26.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £996.13k £1.02m £808.24k £741.60k £1.11m
Expenditure - Governance £113.08k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0