ST DUNSTAN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 16 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 15 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 15 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 21 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 07 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 07 April 2017 On time Download