ST DUNSTAN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £13.08m £13.77m £14.99m £15.63m £15.20m
Total expenditure £12.08m £12.82m £14.09m £14.87m £14.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £353.49k
Income - Donations and legacies £65.57k £83.49k £134.58k £193.37k £76.06k
Income - Other trading activities £538.12k £511.11k £833.02k £1.19m £533.56k
Income - Charitable activities £11.99m £12.70m £13.55m £13.70m £14.19m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £484.26k £472.07k £473.55k £551.20k £404.67k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £71.87k £63.09k £165.45k £61.49k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.59m £12.30m £13.23m £13.69m £13.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £493.30k £520.26k £855.97k £1.17m £554.34k
Expenditure - Governance £122.77k £118.22k £110.03k £100.63k £112.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.42k £1.42k £1.42k £1.42k £1.42k
Expenditure - Investment management £5.48k £21.34k £35.48k £36.58k £27.34k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0