ST DUNSTAN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Katherine Hedderly Trustee 13 March 2020 None on record
LINDA KIERNAN Trustee
ST DUNSTAN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Paul Durgan Trustee 13 June 2015
4ALL - BUILDING COMMUNITY IN WEST DULWICH Received: 4 days late
Andrew Cairns Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
IAN DAVENPORT Trustee 13 June 2015 None on record
Shams Rahman Trustee 06 November 2015 None on record
KEN MARSHALL Trustee None on record
Navdeep Sheera Trustee 10 June 2017
ST DUNSTAN'S COLLEGE GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
NICHOLAS LYONS Trustee 01 December 2017
EAST ANGLIA ART FUND Received: On time
Jonathan Ronan Trustee 13 March 2020 None on record
Rosalind Meredith Trustee 19 March 2021 None on record
Dr YVONNE Ann BURNE OBE Trustee 04 November 2016 None on record
Judy Clements Trustee 15 April 2013
TOGETHER FOR MENTAL WELLBEING Received: On time
SOUTH ENGLAND CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH DAY ADVENTISTS
VICTORIA ALEXANDER Trustee
ST DUNSTAN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MISS DI ROBERTSHAW Trustee None on record
DAVID PROBERT Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record