Trustees LAMDA LTD

Charity number: 312821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RT HON SHAUN ANTHONY WOODWARD Chair 04 March 2013
None on record
Jasmine Derenee Jenkins Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
VIKNENDRAN SIVALINGAM Trustee 17 March 2022
JERMYN STREET THEATRE
Received: On time
THE PRODUCTION EXCHANGE LIMITED
Received: On time
Leah Isabelle Melanie Ferguson Trustee 26 July 2021
None on record
Jemima Rebecca Redgrave Trustee 24 October 2019
None on record
Professor Mohammad Dastbaz Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record
Professor Carole-Anne Upton Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record
Shamez Alibhai Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
Thomas Laing-Baker Trustee 15 February 2018
None on record
LORD THOMAS ORLANDO CHANDOS Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
Helen Sarah Wright Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
John Wynne Owen Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
Joanne Margaret Hirst Trustee 08 June 2017
None on record
Olga Basirov Trustee 07 May 2015
None on record
Sarah Habberfield Trustee 10 July 2014
None on record
Matt Applewhite Trustee 27 February 2014
None on record
PATRICIA ANN HODGE Trustee 17 April 2012
None on record