ROYAL ACADEMY OF DANCE

Charity number: 312826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amy Giancarlo Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
David Nixon OBE Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Esther Chesterman Trustee 11 May 2021
GLOBAL GIRL PROJECT Received: On time
Chi Cao Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
Rachel Jackson-Weingartner Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
Matthew Paluch Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
PENNY PARKS Trustee 03 April 2014
PENNY PARKS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
IDA LEVINE Trustee 28 April 2016
DANCERS' CAREER DEVELOPMENT Received: On time
PETER FLEW Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
James Cane Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
Kevin O'Hare Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
IMOGEN KNIGHT Trustee 27 April 2017
COLOURS OF DANCE RADIATES Received: On time
Joshua Tuifua Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
Darren Parish Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Andrew McIntee Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Victoria Allport Trustee 11 May 2021 None on record
HILARY CLARK Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
ALICESON ROBINSON Trustee 30 May 2013 None on record
Joanna Binder Trustee 21 May 2015 None on record
Mr Guy Perricone Chair 21 May 2015 None on record