Trustees THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUCATION
Charity number: 313082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Louise Cook | Chair | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Sharkey | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaina Barbara Eakers | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Demetriadi | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hopkins | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Mathieson | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Theobald | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Henderson | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Glenda Wyn Tinney | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Lomas | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Peter John Tuck | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sian Hudson | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrina Flinders | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.