Financial history THE DUCHESS OF LEEDS FOUNDATION FOR BOYS AND GIRLS

Charity number: 313103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £70.69k £49.24k £24.63k £85.06k £25.94k
Total expenditure £50.29k £40.94k £37.85k £44.71k £60.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A