Financial history B'NAI B'RITH HILLEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 313503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £885.00k £1.12m £1.13m £1.08m £674.24k
Total expenditure £1.11m £1.30m £1.19m £766.77k £518.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £49.50k N/A N/A £8.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £837.67k £1.09m £1.10m £1.06m £649.98k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £47.33k £34.67k £27.73k £24.32k £24.25k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £400.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.23m £1.14m £711.90k £461.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds £53.13k £71.95k £44.77k £54.87k £57.55k
Expenditure - Governance £19.65k £18.90k £22.80k £18.90k £9.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0