B'NAI B'RITH HILLEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 313503
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 June 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 June 2021 54 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 May 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 09 May 2019 9 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 22 March 2017 On time Download