Trustees B'NAI B'RITH HILLEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 313503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Isaacs Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Joel Rosen Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Elana Dwek Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Daniel Dangoor Trustee 19 May 2021
THE OXFORD SYNAGOGUE AND JEWISH CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE B'NAI BRITH HILLEL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Judith Flacks Trustee 28 August 2020
JEWISH WOMENS AID LIMITED
Received: On time
Louise Goldberg Trustee 28 August 2020
None on record
Hannah Rose Trustee 03 June 2020
None on record
Paul Summerfield Trustee 04 March 2020
None on record
Adam Rose Trustee 11 September 2019
THE YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE B'NAI BRITH HILLEL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JEWISH COUNCIL FOR RACIAL EQUALITY
Received: On time
MASORTI JUDAISM
Received: On time
Spencer Debson Trustee 01 April 2018
THE YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE B'NAI BRITH HILLEL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Mark Barnett Trustee 11 December 2017
THE OXFORD SYNAGOGUE AND JEWISH CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
Mitchell Simmons Trustee 07 October 2015
None on record
Carolyn Bogush Trustee 13 February 2014
None on record