THE CATHOLIC RECORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 313529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 26 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 16 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 16 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2016 18 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 27 January 2017 On time Download