THE CATHOLIC RECORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 313529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020
Total gross income £39.20k £101.30k £31.81k £40.67k £36.93k
Total expenditure £46.20k £23.46k £37.24k £24.81k £18.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A