THE CATHOLIC RECORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 313529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Jonathan Bush Trustee 09 July 2019 None on record
The Revd Stewart Keith Foster Trustee 24 July 2018 None on record
Judith Anne Smeaton Trustee 20 February 2019 None on record
Dr SERENHEDD JAMES Trustee 02 February 2018 None on record
Dr PETER HUGH GERARD DOYLE Trustee None on record
Dr Catherine Mary Gibbons Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
Dr Susan O'Brien Trustee 07 February 2018
THE CAMBRIDGE CITY FOODBANK Received: On time
THE M B RECKITT TRUST Received: On time
Professor William Joseph Sheils Trustee 24 July 2017 None on record
Dr Carmen Margaret Mangion Trustee 09 July 2019 None on record
Alexander Fitzalan Howard Trustee 24 July 2012 None on record
Simon David Aldjo Jamieson Trustee
BRAMPTON TRUST Received: 88 days late
Dr Peter Benedict Nockles Trustee 24 July 2017 None on record
The Revd Peter Edmund Boyle Harris Trustee 24 July 2018 None on record
Dr Paul Arblaster Trustee 23 July 2017 None on record