THE GORDON RUSSELL TRUST

Charity number: 326446
Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gabrielle Falkiner Chair 15 October 2015
ROUNDABOUT (WEST MIDLANDS) LIMITED Received: On time
Jonathan Russell Trustee 11 January 2018 None on record
Anthony Gleave Trustee 10 October 2017 None on record
Christoper Peter Hotten Trustee 10 April 2018 None on record
SEAN FEENEY Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
Helen Brown Trustee 10 January 2018 None on record