Able Child Africa

Charity number: 326859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James William Henry Sellars Trustee 29 January 2018 None on record
Mitul Shah Trustee 19 September 2020 None on record
Catherine Carter Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record
Heather Elizabeth Barr Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record
Catherine Turner Trustee 09 July 2016 None on record
Emily Bueno Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
Martin Hill Trustee 23 March 2019 None on record