Accounts and annual returns SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF THE SUDANS (UK)

Charity number: 328272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required