Financial history SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF THE SUDANS (UK)

Charity number: 328272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.32k £4.75k £5.46k £5.73k £3.72k
Total expenditure £4.76k £5.76k £6.56k £3.37k £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A