Trustees SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF THE SUDANS (UK)

Charity number: 328272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gill Lusk Chair 17 September 2016
THE MINEHEAD AND DISTRICT U3A
Received: On time
Aly Verjee Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Dr Rebecca Elizabeth Bradshaw Trustee 07 September 2019
None on record
Dr Azim El Hassan Trustee 22 September 2018
None on record
Mawan Gordon Muortat Trustee 16 September 2017
None on record
Francis Peter Gotto Trustee 16 September 2017
None on record
Charlotte Vera Martin Trustee 16 September 2017
None on record
Fidaa Mahmoud Trustee 16 September 2017
None on record
Dr Zoe Cormack Trustee 16 September 2017
None on record
Rev ANDREW CHARLES WHEELER Trustee 17 September 2016
Friends of the Anglican Province of Alexandria
Received: On time
THE CHURCH ASSOCIATION FOR SUDAN & SOUTH SUDAN
Received: On time
GUILDFORD TOWN CENTRE CHAPLAINCY
Received: On time
Jane Robinson Hogan Trustee 17 September 2016
None on record
Dr ADRIAN PETER THOMAS OBE Trustee
None on record