Financial history TRUST FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATION ON THE ARMS TRADE (TREAT)

Charity number: 328694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £228.82k £267.52k £368.36k £459.58k £207.31k
Total expenditure £261.07k £246.80k £348.32k £321.15k £348.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A