TRUST FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATION ON THE ARMS TRADE (TREAT)

Charity number: 328694
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samantha Rimmer Trustee 29 November 2018 None on record
Professor ANNA STAVRIANAKIS Trustee 07 March 2012 None on record
Nicholas James Gilby Trustee 15 February 2015 None on record
Helen Close Trustee 07 April 2015 None on record
CHRIS COLE Trustee None on record
Jon Nott Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record