THE ROWLANDS TRUST

Charity number: 1062148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £175.06k £159.17k £135.84k £114.57k £90.31k
Total expenditure £984.82k £570.02k £836.18k £365.20k £335.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A