Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (SOMERSET BRANCH)

Charity number: 1061910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 16 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 14 January 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required