Financial history THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY (SOMERSET BRANCH)

Charity number: 1061910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020 01/01/2021
Total gross income £3.69k £5.90k £3.15k £4.49k £3.10k
Total expenditure £3.64k £5.12k £2.70k £3.93k £2.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A