TEENAGE CANCER TRUST

Charity number: 1062559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.25m £16.02m £23.05m £18.35m £15.63m
Total expenditure £15.28m £15.57m £24.48m £17.47m £14.96m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £1.13m
Income - Donations and legacies £12.57m £12.09m £18.34m £14.68m £13.79m
Income - Other trading activities £2.61m £3.75m £4.63m £3.60m £679.37k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £119.54k £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £72.22k £62.31k £88.32k £74.33k £32.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.13m
Income - Legacies £94.38k £96.16k £173.77k £430.62k £235.35k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.67m £9.47m £15.23m £10.55m £9.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.61m £6.10m £9.26m £6.91m £5.17m
Expenditure - Governance £176.10k £184.10k £326.79k £510.85k £527.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0