Trustees STOP HATE UK
Charity number: 1062692

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suemeng Chan | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
William George McAdam | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Paulette Ward | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Anthony Culleton | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Moslem Boushehrian | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanne Smith | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eunah Shin | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jonathan Garland | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Umit Ozturk | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.