Financial history MARINE STEWARDSHIP COUNCIL

Charity number: 1066806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £24.88m £26.29m £29.47m £30.10m £29.79m
Total expenditure £20.23m £23.63m £26.91m £27.24m £28.67m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.85m £3.89m £4.38m £3.46k £2.41m
Income - Other trading activities £619.86k £947.00k £859.00k £604 £507.00k
Income - Charitable activities £18.06m £20.95m £23.73m £25.62k £26.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £340.10k £513.00k £497.00k £416 £744.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.76m £23.12m £26.30m £26.79m £28.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £469.27k £510.00k £616.00k £452.00k £621.00k
Expenditure - Governance £334.60k £0 £0 £316 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £55.09k £0 £0 £82 £96.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0